Financial history COBHAM HALL HERITAGE TRUST

Charity number: 292332
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £4.48k £8.88k £7.41k £6.35k £1.61k
Total expenditure £8.57k £1.20k £8.98k £6.38k £14.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A