WOKINGHAM THEATRE

Charity number: 292448
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £204.83k £220.02k £240.50k £151.04k £49.26k
Total expenditure £139.44k £138.50k £147.42k £129.50k £126.58k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £15.00k £15.00k £19.33k