Financial history CARE INTERNATIONAL UK

Charity number: 292506
Charity reporting is up to date (156 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £55.64m £65.08m £73.88m £62.72m £38.57m
Total expenditure £68.11m £66.88m £71.12m £67.73m £31.39m
Income from government contracts £2.84m £1.54m £1.88m £1.64m £1.18m
Income from government grants £32.00m £41.79m £52.45m £42.50m £16.88m
Income - Donations and legacies £11.62m £11.36m £10.36m £11.45m £14.95m
Income - Other trading activities £250.00k £263.00k £227.00k £190.00k £178.00k
Income - Charitable activities £43.70m £53.33m £63.07m £50.80m £22.84m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £36.00k £49.00k £54.00k £20.00k £18.00k
Income - Other £39.00k £77.00k £163.00k £261.00k £579.00k
Income - Legacies £185.00k £0 £0 £116.00k £426.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £62.41m £62.15m £67.13m £63.55m £27.53m
Expenditure - Raising funds £5.49m £4.59m £3.99m £4.18m £3.86m
Expenditure - Governance £322.00k £3.19m £230.00k £315.00k £556.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £198.00k £151.00k £0 £0 £0