HAZRAT SULTAN BAHU TRUST (UK)

Charity number: 292697
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.32m £2.69m £2.43m £2.38m £2.34m
Total expenditure £2.15m £2.29m £2.18m £2.25m £2.25m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.03m £2.33m £2.18m £2.09m £2.02m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £39.88k £283.12k £298.03k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £281.93k £368.53k £214.63k £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £14.13k £25.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.09m £2.15m £2.15m £2.14m £2.14m
Expenditure - Raising funds £60.00k £137.58k £29.62k £103.28k £106.64k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £39.51k £37.57k £17.41k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £14.79k £13.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0