Financial history NORTH LONDON RUDOLF STEINER SCHOOL

Charity number: 292776
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £149.42k £150.60k £149.22k £186.03k £186.83k
Total expenditure £182.81k £154.96k £149.23k £163.21k £183.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £45.15k £42.03k