Financial history ST. MARY ABBOTS REHABILITATION AND TRAINING PROJECTS (SMART)

Charity number: 292787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £800.69k £731.98k £917.51k £1.01m £1.26m
Total expenditure £796.91k £776.12k £987.79k £943.81k £1.02m
Income from government contracts £493.00k N/A £434.36k £425.94k £425.94k
Income from government grants £49.38k £290.00k £163.65k £132.88k £273.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £745.25k £690.97k £873.88k £947.65k £1.24m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £55.44k £40.99k £43.60k £58.63k £25.26k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2 £0 £25 £5 £0
Income - Other £0 £22 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £796.91k £776.12k £987.79k £943.81k £1.02m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £8.16k £7.82k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0