Accounts and annual returns BUCKINGHAM AND DISTRICT AGE CONCERN

Charity number: 293094
Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 106 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 106 days
Annual return 30 April 2022 04 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 04 August 2022 157 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 04 August 2022 522 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 21 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required