Financial history BUCKINGHAM AND DISTRICT AGE CONCERN

Charity number: 293094
Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022
Total gross income £8.05k £8.83k £2.04k £0 £4.07k
Total expenditure £7.65k £5.74k £4.84k £2.28k £4.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A