Financial history THE D N AND C H TARSH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 293281
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £3.11k £1.71k £1.70k £1.66k £696
Total expenditure £5.75k £3.52k £5.20k £2.64k £4.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A