E L M V SHADWELL BASIN PROJECT

Charity number: 293475
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Moules Trustee 18 December 2019 None on record
Elizabeth Gyurindak Trustee 19 April 2021 None on record
THOMAS NATHANIEL HENDERSON Chair None on record
Stewart Keep Trustee 22 January 2018
THE NORTH LONDON YOUTH SAILING TRUST Received: On time
Chris McClelland Trustee 06 July 2021 None on record
Sarah Wallis Trustee 15 November 2012 None on record
ANDREW KTENAS Trustee 14 November 2013 None on record
Herman Ringer Trustee 15 February 2021 None on record
PENNY BRUCE-WALKER - Vice Chair Trustee 19 November 2007 None on record
MR DAN JONES Trustee 15 November 2012
INTERNATIONAL CHILDREN'S TRUST Received: On time
BODYTREE UK LTD Overdue by 515 days
DANIEL ABEL Trustee 20 June 2011 None on record
NATALIE MADEROVA Trustee 20 May 2013 None on record
Erin Baltes Trustee 21 January 2021 None on record