Trustees AAGBI FOUNDATION
Charity number: 293575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr MATTHEW DAVIES | Chair | 28 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tendai Nicholas Ramhewa | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrzej Wlaszczyk | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew Dominic Wiles | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rebecca Barker | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Louise Amanda Swan | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stuart John Burgess | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Benjamin Luke Fox | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Craig Carroll | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Philip Barclay | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stuart Andrew Edwardson | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Victoria Louise McCormack | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emma Charlotte Elizabeth Wain | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Subrahmanyan Radhakrishna | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Mullarkey | Trustee | 02 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kenneth Barker | Trustee | 25 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Edward Hendon Ward | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert Self | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR Tei Elizabeth Sheraton | Trustee | 24 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
DR Ravijit Singh Gill | Trustee | 24 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
DR Andrew Klein | Trustee | 24 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
DR Timothy Meek | Trustee | 18 September 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.