Trustees THE FAIRGROUND HERITAGE TRUST

Charity number: 293579
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Charles Phillipps Trustee 11 December 2021
None on record
Amy Goodwin Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Aaron Stephens Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Mark Bryan Trustee 30 November 2019
None on record
Adam Brown Trustee 30 November 2019
None on record
PHIL WRIXON Trustee 06 March 2012
None on record
KEVIN GAMLEN Trustee 30 August 2011
None on record
GUY BELSHAW Trustee 27 August 2011
None on record
ANTHONY SIMON REED Trustee 03 December 2005
None on record
RICHARD HENRY CLUTTON WARD Trustee
None on record
DAVID WALLIS Trustee
None on record