WHITCHURCH VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 293682
Charity reporting is overdue by 18 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 18 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 18 days
Annual return 31 October 2019 29 September 2020 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 September 2020 29 days late Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 30 December 2019 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 30 December 2019 121 days late Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 24 December 2019 480 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 27 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 28 September 2017 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 28 September 2017 28 days late Download