WHITCHURCH VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 293682
Charity reporting is overdue by 27 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2015 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019
Total gross income £27.30k £29.89k £27.32k £25.96k £31.64k
Total expenditure £28.01k £28.63k £40.08k £29.78k £26.65k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A