Accounts and annual returns ABSHOT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 293767
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 January 2023 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 17 January 2023 78 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 August 2021 299 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 17 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window