Financial history ABSHOT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 293767
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £29.55k £21.93k £23.68k £64.76k £32.45k
Total expenditure £31.98k £27.40k £22.76k £63.14k £35.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £750 N/A £11.33k £32.91k £500