Dogfen lywodraethu CLEVELAND BAY HORSE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED KINGDOM

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/01/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/10/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/10/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/04/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/01/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/10/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/10/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 OCT 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1 TO ENCOURAGE THE BREEDING AND IMPROVEMENT OF HORSES, PARTICULARLY THE CLEVELAND BAY. 2 TO IMPROVE THE GENERAL STANDARDS IN THE MANAGEMENT, USE AND TREATMENT OF HORSES GENERALLY AND OF THE CLEVELAND BAY HORSE IN PARTICULAR BY FACILITATING THE DISTRIBUTION AND ACQUISITION OF KNOWLEDGE AND LEARNING AMONG BREEDERS, OWNERS, JUDGES, VETERINARIANS, TRAINERS AND MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC; AND 3 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, THROUGH THE USE OF HORSES, BUT CONFINED TO FACILITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITHIN THE MEANING AND SO AS TO SATISFY THE REQUIREMENTS OF THE RECREATIONAL CHARITIES ACT 1958 4 TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO AND PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF HORSES
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.