17TH PURLEY ST JOHN'S OLD COULSDON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 293899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £25.87k £38.00k £37.47k £39.70k £21.40k
Total expenditure £27.13k £30.67k £37.92k £37.43k £18.62k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £2.50k N/A £488 N/A