17TH PURLEY ST JOHN'S OLD COULSDON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 293899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Samantha Kindred Trustee 27 May 2021 None on record
Anthony John Docwra Trustee 12 May 2018 None on record
Jill Mary Waters Trustee 12 May 2018 None on record
Mark Peter Kingett Trustee 12 May 2018 None on record
Malcolm John Lockyer Trustee 12 May 2018 None on record
Peter James Low Trustee 12 May 2018 None on record
Ben Kindred Trustee 27 May 2021 None on record
Dawn Karen Lockyer Trustee 12 May 2018 None on record
Jonathan Mark Waters Trustee 12 May 2018 None on record
Louise Swift Trustee 27 May 2021 None on record
MICHAEL GARLICK Chair 08 May 2016 None on record
Philip Bickerstaffe Trustee 08 May 2019 None on record
Malcolm Bulbeck Trustee 19 November 2019 None on record
John Rothwell Edwards Trustee 12 May 2018 None on record
Angela Marie Martin Trustee 12 May 2018 None on record
Rev Paul Carlton Roberts Trustee 12 May 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST, OLD COULSDON IN THE DIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK Received: On time
Jeffrey Locke Trustee 12 May 2018 None on record
Sarah Farooki Trustee 12 May 2018 None on record
Simon Jackson Trustee 01 September 2017 None on record