MAPLE LEAF TRUST

Charity number: 294037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £67.59k £31.44k £386.35k £37.69k £324.83k
Total expenditure £30.20k £78.99k £190.51k £99.02k £244.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A