THE WOMENS' CENTRE SUTTON

Charity number: 294067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £115.11k £129.66k £194.40k £158.03k £237.42k
Total expenditure £94.40k £119.05k £138.47k £147.51k £229.86k
Income from government contracts £31.98k £0 £51.46k £12.00k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £51.30k N/A N/A £63.84k