Accounts and annual returns THE WOODLAND TRUST

Charity number: 294344
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 29 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 29 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 03 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 06 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 06 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 10 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 10 August 2017 On time Download Open in new window