Financial history THE WOODLAND TRUST

Charity number: 294344
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/05/2021
Total gross income £49.59m £45.24m £44.62m £56.08m £87.49m
Total expenditure £38.63m £45.25m £48.23m £53.32m £70.15m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £95.12k £290.15k £4.76m
Income from government grants £1.79m £3.02m £2.28m £3.14m £4.66m
Income - Donations and legacies £37.83m £31.01m £31.01m £40.26m £61.89m
Income - Other trading activities £6.07m £6.29m £6.93m £6.53m £11.30m
Income - Charitable activities £4.86m £6.98m £5.74m £8.26m £12.99m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £801.00k £779.00k £845.00k £864.00k £1.02m
Income - Other £33.00k £174.00k £91.00k £165.00k £285.00k
Income - Legacies £21.95m £15.38m £14.28m £14.27m £14.27m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £31.23m £37.01m £38.59m £42.95m £57.31m
Expenditure - Raising funds £7.40m £8.24m £9.64m £10.38m £12.84m
Expenditure - Governance £130.00k £159.00k £193.00k £246.00k £320.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £274.00k £445.00k £0 £508.00k £823.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £32.00k £72.00k £173.00k £159.00k £255.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0