Trustees THE WOODLAND TRUST

Charity number: 294344
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BARONESS YOUNG OF OLD SCONE BARBARA SCOTT YOUNG Chair 11 January 2016
None on record
Stephen James Horley Trustee 18 September 2020
None on record
Andrew Leigh Bryant Trustee 18 September 2020
None on record
Chrisostomos Zissis Trustee 12 June 2020
None on record
Mark Robin Preston Trustee 27 September 2019
None on record
Dr Fay Margaret Cooke Trustee 07 December 2018
None on record
James Frederick Ogilvie Trustee 26 September 2018
None on record
SALLY KATHERINE BENTHALL MA CANTAB Trustee 24 March 2017
LANDWORKS
Received: On time
JULIA MARY SMITHIES Trustee 24 March 2017
None on record