HESTIA HOUSING AND SUPPORT

Charity number: 294555
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £23.71m £24.34m £26.89m £30.21m £31.72m
Total expenditure £23.65m £24.07m £26.82m £29.98m £31.59m
Income from government contracts £13.30m £14.23m £16.33m £11.16m £21.14m
Income from government grants £1.33m £1.33m £7.02m £9.92m £1.67m
Income - Donations and legacies £131.32k £157.73k £356.57k £818.47k £726.09k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £23.40m £23.98m £26.35m £29.14m £30.77m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £174.34k £198.18k £178.40k £258.04k £225.05k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £23.35m £23.75m £26.56m £29.67m £31.09m
Expenditure - Raising funds £304.87k £279.82k £258.09k £307.13k £288.00k
Expenditure - Governance £96.46k £100.79k £114.86k £110.45k £115.68k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £43.20k £43.20k £0 £48.46k £51.06k
Expenditure - Other £0 £41.04k £0 £0 £211.44k