Accounts and annual returns HOUSING JUSTICE

Charity number: 294666
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 14 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 19 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window