Financial history HOUSING JUSTICE

Charity number: 294666
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £537.99k £520.79k £1.21m £1.33m £1.40m
Total expenditure £518.29k £542.22k £817.23k £1.26m £903.62k
Income from government contracts £0 £35.71k N/A £104.00k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £12.00k £505.45k £476.84k £1.19m
Income - Donations and legacies £496.67k £473.62k £1.11m £1.31m £1.37m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £40.92k £46.92k £97.88k £15.33k £26.52k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £401 £255 £631 £960 £235
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £33.67k £177.45k £14.12k £2.72k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £420.86k £435.35k £759.73k £1.23m £862.71k
Expenditure - Raising funds £97.43k £106.87k £57.51k £26.27k £40.91k
Expenditure - Governance £15.69k £16.51k £18.14k £13.19k £14.03k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £251.32k £408.75k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0