THE KENNINGHALL BELLS RESTORATION AND MAINTENANCE FUND

Charity number: 294818
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £105 £845 £225 £292 £142
Total expenditure £1.29k £0 £0 £1 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A