Trustees WALSINGHAM SUPPORT
Charity number: 294832
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Edward Longley Cooke | Chair | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Jane Cox | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ANTHONY MARCHANT | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Ellen Craig | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Miller | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Andrew John Walji | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
CADANNA LLWELLYN-PEART | Trustee | 20 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALISON MARGARET HEATON | Trustee | 28 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mark Best | Trustee | 27 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Edwards | Trustee | 21 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD KEAGAN-BULL | Trustee | 23 July 2013 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.