3RD MARSHLAND SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 294870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.95k £7.53k £6.89k £5.86k £25.16k
Total expenditure £5.64k £10.56k £6.44k £5.54k £17.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £23.74k