Dogfen lywodraethu EASTERN ANGLES THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/04/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/07/1986 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25 JUL 2017 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 03 JUL 2017 as amended on 12 Oct 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY BY THE PRODUCTION OF EDUCATIONAL PLAYS AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS, INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, SINGING AND MUSIC, LITERATURE AND POETRY.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.