ALDWICK PRESERVATION SOCIETY

Charity number: 295133
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £2.99k £1.89k £1.21k £1.76k £2.85k
Total expenditure £2.02k £2.43k £2.58k £2.17k £5.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A