Financial history THE PLAYGOERS SOCIETY OF DARTINGTON HALL

Charity number: 295546
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £21.76k £18.00k £1.98k £5.70k £2.44k
Total expenditure £18.18k £13.00k £3.50k £4.07k £1.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A