OLD PHAROSIANS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 295653
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £1.45k £1.34k £1.43k £1.68k £1.55k
Total expenditure £765 £1.62k £1.22k £2.32k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A