Dogfen lywodraethu JUVENILE DIABETES RESEARCH FOUNDATION LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 NOVEMBER 1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 26 APRIL 1990, 25 MARCH 1996, 9 AUGUST 2005 AND 1 DECEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17 MAR 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH TOWARDS FINDING A CURE FOR TYPE 1 (JUVENILE) DIABETES, INCLUDING ITS PREVENTION AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; B) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AMONGST PERSONS WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM TYPE 1 (JUVENILE) DIABETES; C) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION ABOUT DIABETES AND PARTICULARLY TYPE 1 (JUVENILE) DIABETES.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.