Accounts and annual returns HADDENHAM AND DISTRICT AGE CONCERN

Charity number: 295739
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required