THE DORKING CONCERTGOERS SOCIETY

Charity number: 295839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £47.89k £28.38k £34.80k £23.64k £24.88k
Total expenditure £49.13k £41.90k £43.12k £22.29k £19.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A