Financial history FOUNDATION FOR CONDUCTIVE EDUCATION

Charity number: 295873
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £1.08m £1.07m £1.02m £1.08m £974.65k
Total expenditure £1.04m £1.03m £990.41k £1.03m £968.13k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £139.27k £191.74k £261.35k
Income from government grants £162.53k N/A N/A £55.65k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £356.75k £366.11k £455.83k £501.44k £425.75k
Income - Other trading activities £88.64k £94.30k £67.30k £64.58k £17.55k
Income - Charitable activities £619.85k £611.12k £482.94k £497.65k £531.35k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1 £0 £1 £1 £0
Income - Other £15.02k £0 £9.29k £13.25k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £500 £1.20k £1.00k £1.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £935.52k £920.65k £889.54k £948.28k £910.43k
Expenditure - Raising funds £102.05k £106.37k £100.88k £80.29k £57.70k
Expenditure - Governance £7.34k £6.96k £6.96k £6.96k £6.96k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0