THE FRENCH PORCELAIN SOCIETY

Charity number: 296085
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £45.89k £33.45k £48.46k £51.23k £39.30k
Total expenditure £45.49k £40.08k £28.31k £54.37k £27.05k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A