Dogfen lywodraethu INTERNATIONAL MASONRY SOCIETY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
RULES 16TH JUNE 1986 CONSTITUTION 4TH JUNE 1987 AS AMENDED 24TH JULY 1989 AND 26 JUNE 1998, AS AMENDED 19 NOVEMBER 2001
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3.1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROMOTION AND PROVISION OF DISCUSSION AND ELUCIDATION OF THE SCIENCE AND PRACTICE OF MASONRY INCLUDING THE SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY OF ITS CONSTITUENT MATERIALS, THE AESTHETIC, ENGINEERING, CONSTRUCTIONAL DESIGN AND THE BUILDING AND SUPERVISION OF STRUCTURES AND FORMS AND THE BEHAVIOUR OF THE MATERIALS IN USE, FOR THE PURPOSE OF IMPROVING UNDERSTANDING OF THE PERFORMANCE OF THE MATERIAL TO THE BENEFIT OF MANUFACTURERS, PRACTITIONERS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN PROVIDING A MORE LASTING, AESTHETICALLY PLEASING, HEALTHY AND SOCIALLY DESIRABLE LIVING ENVIRONMENT. 3.2) FOR THOSE PURPOSES TO PROVIDE MEANS FOR BRINGING INTO CONTACT AND ASSOCIATION THOSE ENGAGED IN MASONRY SCIENCE, DESIGN AND INDUSTRY AND LIKEWISE TO RECEIVE, EDIT, PRINT AND PUBLISH PAPERS AND OTHER LITERARY UNDERTAKINGS AND TO FORM OR MAINTAIN A LIBRARY OF MASONRY AND ALLIED LITERATURE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.