Financial history HARKSTEAD CHURCH HERITAGE

Charity number: 296889
Charity reporting is overdue by 33 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £20.36k £76.51k £6.66k £4.00k £3.68k
Total expenditure £12.43k £95.58k £1.51k £559 £684
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.20k N/A N/A N/A N/A