THE GREEN WICKET SANCTUARY

Charity number: 297066
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.91k £4.05k £5.16k £2.25k £2.23k
Total expenditure £23.38k £9.79k £11.76k £4.42k £2.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A