Dogfen lywodraethu KATHARINE HOUSE HOSPICE TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 MAY 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 6 SEPTEMBER 1995, 5 SEPTEMBER 2001 AND 7 FEBRUARY 2008. as amended on 26 Jun 2020 as amended on 15 Dec 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(a) To provide a public benefit to support those with incurable illness and their families from diagnosis onwards directly and via partnership with other healthcare providers. With particular focus to funding and supporting the work of Katharine House Hospice in Adderbury, and the outreach to patients at home. (b) To educate and inform on end of life and palliative care, through outreach work in the community and the provision of funds and training. (c) To maintain the Katharine House Hospice building in Aynho Rd, Adderbury.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.