Financial history PLAINSONG AND MEDIAEVAL MUSIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 297147
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.42k £6.00k £3.92k £2.75k £2.08k
Total expenditure £2.23k £6.04k £614 £4.21k £2.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A