Financial history RIVER VALLEY CENTRE

Charity number: 297501
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £23.12k £20.13k £19.87k £18.28k £24.27k
Total expenditure £19.82k £17.70k £19.39k £19.10k £14.94k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.50k £0 N/A N/A £18.72k