Accounts and annual returns THE ROTARY CLUB OF YEO VALE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 297516
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 14 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 14 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 14 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 23 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 20 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required