Financial history THE ROTARY CLUB OF YEO VALE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 297516
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £16.25k £12.60k £17.92k £8.85k £9.20k
Total expenditure £12.14k £9.12k £13.99k £11.48k £7.17k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A