Financial history THE VIRGIN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 297540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £15.55m £10.49m £11.54m £7.79m £11.95m
Total expenditure £12.85m £14.50m £18.02m £14.09m £12.46m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £15.55m £10.49m £6.61m £7.79m £11.76m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £421.78k £0 £194.00k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £11.76m
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £4.51m £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £11.21m £13.90m £15.35m £13.55m £11.71m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.64m £606.00k £659.00k £547.00k £753.00k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £630.00k £301.00k £3.82m £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £7.84m £11.97m £9.73m £11.71m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £2.02m £0 £0