ACTION FOR INTEGRATED DEVELOPMENT (AID)

Charity number: 297944
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £163.52k £145.86k £24.86k £23.72k £18.45k
Total expenditure £155.08k £157.15k £18.93k £15.44k £17.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A