Financial history OXTED AND LIMPSFIELD CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 298200
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £9.92k £10.05k £9.70k £6.96k £311
Total expenditure £9.07k £8.49k £8.99k £6.80k £1.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A